AL SB295 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eminent domain proceedings, costs, condemnation proceedings filed by Dept. of Transportation, the department pays condemnee's reasonable attorney fees, appraisal and engineering costs if final award is 20 percent or higher than department's offer, Sec. 18-1A-293 am'd.
Title
Eminent domain proceedings, costs, condemnation proceedings filed by Dept. of Transportation, the department pays condemnee's reasonable attorney fees, appraisal and engineering costs if final award is 20 percent or higher than department's offer, Sec. 18-1A-293 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2016-04-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 697 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |