AL SB295 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Forwarded to Governor on June 1, 2011 at 6:55 p.m. on June 1, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Forwarded to Governor on June 1, 2011 at 6:55 p.m. on June 1, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Individual Development Account Program, established in Human Resources Department, created for individuals with low income
Title
Individual Development Account Program, established in Human Resources Department, created for individuals with low income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Forwarded to Governor on June 1, 2011 at 6:55 p.m. on June 1, 2011 | |
2011-06-01 | Assigned Act No. 2011-641. | |
2011-06-01 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-01 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-01 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1048 | |
2011-06-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 552 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 551 | |
2011-05-05 | Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-29 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources |