AL SB294 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery Co., sheriff authorized to participate in Employees' Retirement System in lieu of supernumerary program, const. amend.
Title
Montgomery Co., sheriff authorized to participate in Employees' Retirement System in lieu of supernumerary program, const. amend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |