AL SB291 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 852
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 852
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal officials, requires officials to participate in training
Title
Municipal officials, requires officials to participate in training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 852 (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 532 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt - Roll Call 531 MFJD1HH-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt - Roll Call 530 2AMYKSI-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 532 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt - Roll Call 531 MFJD1HH-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Waggoner motion to Adopt - Roll Call 530 2AMYKSI-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 852 |
2024-04-25 | House | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-18 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | House | Pending House County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 532 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Elliott motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 531 MFJD1HH-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Elliott 1st Amendment Offered MFJD1HH-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Waggoner motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 530 2AMYKSI-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | County and Municipal Government 1st Amendment Offered 2AMYKSI-1 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | Senate | County and Municipal Government 1st Amendment 2AMYKSI-1 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government |