AL SB291 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Beneficiaries, permit Supernumerary Circuit Clerk or Register to change beneficiary, seek refund under certain circumstances, Secs. 12-17-142, 12-17-143 am'd.
Title
Beneficiaries, permit Supernumerary Circuit Clerk or Register to change beneficiary, seek refund under certain circumstances, Secs. 12-17-142, 12-17-143 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Singleton motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |