AL SB291 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2015-210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2015-210.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
University of North Alabama, board of trustees, terms of office revised, meetings by teleconference, Secs. 16-51-3, 16-51-4 am'd.
Title
University of North Alabama, board of trustees, terms of office revised, meetings by teleconference, Secs. 16-51-3, 16-51-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-210. |
2015-05-19 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-05-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 767 |
2015-05-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 353 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 352 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Stutts Motion to Table Figures Amendment Lost Voice Vote |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Figures Amendment Offered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 351 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Stutts first Substitute Offered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |