AL SB290 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned Act No. 2018-432.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned Act No. 2018-432.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clay Co., tobacco tax, distrib. further provided for, Act 2017-65, 2017 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 45-14-244.07 am'd.
Title
Clay Co., tobacco tax, distrib. further provided for, Act 2017-65, 2017 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 45-14-244.07 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-432. |
2018-03-21 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-20 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 915 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 798 |
2018-03-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 797 |
2018-03-15 | House | Hurst Amendment Offered |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 406 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |