AL SB29 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Liquefied Petroleum Gas Board, LP-Gas Recovery Fund abolished, board required to post rules in lieu of mailing, surety in cash requirement for permit holders deleted, permit F further provide for, Secs. 9-17-100, 9-17-101, 9-17-103, 9-17-104, 9-17-105, 9-17-106, 9-17-107, 9-17-109, 9-17-121, 9-17-122, 40-17-161, 40-17-164, 40-17-165 am'd.
Title
Liquefied Petroleum Gas Board, LP-Gas Recovery Fund abolished, board required to post rules in lieu of mailing, surety in cash requirement for permit holders deleted, permit F further provide for, Secs. 9-17-100, 9-17-101, 9-17-103, 9-17-104, 9-17-105, 9-17-106, 9-17-107, 9-17-109, 9-17-121, 9-17-122, 40-17-161, 40-17-164, 40-17-165 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Ross motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Energy and Natural Resources |