AL SB29 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 11:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and offenses, creating the crimes of elder abuse and neglect and financial exploitation of an elderly person in the first, second, and third degree

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses, creating the crimes of elder abuse and neglect and financial exploitation of an elderly person in the first, second, and third degree

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-21 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - DeMarco motion to reconsider (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20SenateForwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 11:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013
2013-05-20SenateAssigned Act No. 2013-307.
2013-05-20SenateEnrolled
2013-05-20HouseSignature Requested
2013-05-20HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2013-05-20SenateMarsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1168
2013-05-20SenateConcurrence Requested
2013-05-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1254
2013-05-20HouseDeMarco motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call 1253
2013-05-20HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1252
2013-05-20HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1251
2013-05-20HouseDeMarco Amendment Offered
2013-05-20HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-03-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-02-21HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy
2013-02-21SenateEngrossed
2013-02-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 110
2013-02-19SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 109
2013-02-19SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2013-02-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-02-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2013-02-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB29
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB29-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB29-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/SB29-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=456818&VOTE=109&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=456819&VOTE=110&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476486&VOTE=1251&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476487&VOTE=1252&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476491&VOTE=1253&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476492&VOTE=1254&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=476628&VOTE=1168&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback