AL SB289 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-402.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Assigned Act No. 2018-402.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electric lines, high voltage overhead lines, operation of equipment, etc, near prohibited under certain conditions, distance increased, warning signs on certain equipment required, Secs. 37-8-52, 37-8-53 am'd.
Title
Electric lines, high voltage overhead lines, operation of equipment, etc, near prohibited under certain conditions, distance increased, warning signs on certain equipment required, Secs. 37-8-52, 37-8-53 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-402. |
2018-03-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 962 |
2018-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 785 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |