AL SB289 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Delivered to Governor at 3:31 p.m. on April 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Delivered to Governor at 3:31 p.m. on April 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile Co., district attorneys office, employees, appointment, comp., funding, Act 82-675, 1982 First Sp. Sess., and Act 88-423, 1988 Reg. Sess., repealed
Title
Mobile Co., district attorneys office, employees, appointment, comp., funding, Act 82-675, 1982 First Sp. Sess., and Act 88-423, 1988 Reg. Sess., repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor at 3:31 p.m. on April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-211. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-04-25 | House | Signature Requested |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2017-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 581 |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 346 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Mobile County |