AL SB289 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial motor vehicles, load securement certification, metal coils, operator not required to carry certification in vehicle or produce on demand, Sec. 32-9A-2 am'd.
Title
Commercial motor vehicles, load securement certification, metal coils, operator not required to carry certification in vehicle or produce on demand, Sec. 32-9A-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 2:00 p.m. on June 2, 2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-638. | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 594 | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-29 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |