AL SB288 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, write-in candidates, procedure for counting write-in votes, Sec. 17-6-28 am'd.
Title
Elections, write-in candidates, procedure for counting write-in votes, Sec. 17-6-28 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-02-28 | Taylor motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-02-28 | Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-28 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-02-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |