AL SB287 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-443.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, income tax refund check-off for contributions to USS Alabama Battleship Commission, Sec. 40-18-140 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, income tax refund check-off for contributions to USS Alabama Battleship Commission, Sec. 40-18-140 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-443.
2015-06-04SenateEnrolled
2015-06-04HouseSignature Requested
2015-06-04SenatePassed Second House
2015-06-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1237
2015-06-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-21HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-04-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
2015-04-09SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 426
2015-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-04-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-03-19SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback