AL SB287 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Conference Committee on SB287 2013RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Conference Committee on SB287 2013RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco master settlement, transfer of funds to State General Fund, portion appropriated to University of South Alabama
Title
Tobacco master settlement, transfer of funds to State General Fund, portion appropriated to University of South Alabama
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Smitherman table Smitherman motion to reconsider (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 8 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Clouse motion to Accede (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Smitherman table Smitherman motion to reconsider (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 8 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Clouse motion to Accede (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Conference Committee on SB287 2013RS first Substitute Offered |
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-289. |
2013-05-20 | House | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Concurred in Conference Report |
2013-05-20 | House | Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1225 |
2013-05-20 | House | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Smitherman table Smitherman motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call 1021 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1020 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee lost Roll Call 1019 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1018 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Conference Report |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-05-02 | House | Hubbard (J) inadvertently voted "Nay" and intended to vote "Yea" |
2013-05-02 | House | Clouse motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1058 House appoints Clouse, Barton and Newton (C) |
2013-05-02 | House | Conference Committee Requested |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 715 P&PO appoints Orr, Williams, Phil and Beasley |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 713 |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 712 |
2013-04-23 | House | Ford Amendment Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 711 |
2013-04-23 | House | Barton first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-03-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 210 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 209 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |