AL SB284 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Banking, loans and consumer credit transactions, small loans, acquisition charge prohibited on refinances within first six months, deferred presentment transaction, term set at 30 days, total transactions limited, collection activity limited, repayment plan for certain transactions set at three months, interest on loan over $2,000 limited, Secs. 5-18-15, 5-18A-3, 5-18A-12, 5-18A-13, 8-8-5 am'd.
Title
Banking, loans and consumer credit transactions, small loans, acquisition charge prohibited on refinances within first six months, deferred presentment transaction, term set at 30 days, total transactions limited, collection activity limited, repayment plan for certain transactions set at three months, interest on loan over $2,000 limited, Secs. 5-18-15, 5-18A-3, 5-18A-12, 5-18A-13, 8-8-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Banking and Insurance first Amendment Offered |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Banking and Insurance first Substitute Offered |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee Banking and Insurance |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |