AL SB282 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Boats, motorboats, operation on Lewis Smith Lake, Lake Wedowee, and portion of Shoal Creek, wakeboarding and wakesurfing reg., operation near coastline prohibited, Lake Martin add to lake law applies; operation on lakes near shoreline prohibited, penalties, grace period.
Title
Boats, motorboats, operation on Lewis Smith Lake, Lake Wedowee, and portion of Shoal Creek, wakeboarding and wakesurfing reg., operation near coastline prohibited, Lake Martin add to lake law applies; operation on lakes near shoreline prohibited, penalties, grace period.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Hovey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |