AL SB282 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Assigned Act No. 2022-419.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Assigned Act No. 2022-419.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal courts, traffic tickets, fines and penalties, municipalities limited in the amount of money a municipality may retain, transfer of excess to State Finance Department for further distribution
Title
Municipal courts, traffic tickets, fines and penalties, municipalities limited in the amount of money a municipality may retain, transfer of excess to State Finance Department for further distribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - HBIR: Givan motion to Adopt Roll Call 895 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 749 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 748 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 746 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 749 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 748 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 746 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-419. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-05 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-04-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Voice Vote 896 |
2022-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-29 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Gudger motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 749 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Gudger motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Gudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 748 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Gudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 747 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB389 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Governmental Affairs