AL SB280 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Education Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
County Superintendent of Education, required to be appointed unless provided otherwise by constitution
Title
County Superintendent of Education, required to be appointed unless provided otherwise by constitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Education Policy |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 725 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 724 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |