AL SB280 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vital Records, State Registrar authorized to issue Certificate of Foreign Birth without judicial proceedings if certain criteria are satisfied, Karina's Law, Sec. 22-9A-11.1 added
Title
Vital Records, State Registrar authorized to issue Certificate of Foreign Birth without judicial proceedings if certain criteria are satisfied, Karina's Law, Sec. 22-9A-11.1 added
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Allen [R] | Sen. Scott Beason [R] | Sen. Ben Brooks [R] | Sen. Paul Bussman [R] |
Sen. Gerald Dial [R] | Sen. Jimmy Holley [R] | Sen. Greg Reed [R] | Sen. Bryan Taylor [R] |
Sen. Phillip Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Forwarded to Executive Department | |
2012-04-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-03-22 | Passed Second House | |
2012-03-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 500 | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government | |
2012-02-28 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 160 | |
2012-02-23 | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 159 | |
2012-02-23 | Williams Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 158 | |
2012-02-23 | Williams Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources |