AL SB28 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal mischief in the second degree, crime involving church or religious building, mandatory minimum jail time for second or subsequent offenses, restitution a priority, Sec. 13A-7-22 am'd.
Title
Criminal mischief in the second degree, crime involving church or religious building, mandatory minimum jail time for second or subsequent offenses, restitution a priority, Sec. 13A-7-22 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 114 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |