AL SB277 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Holidays, to allow seasonal religious displays
Title
Holidays, to allow seasonal religious displays
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment |
2015-05-21 | House | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2015-05-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-04-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 344 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |