AL SB276 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-461.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Russell Co., sheriffs, additional qualifications, continuing education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Russell Co., sheriffs, additional qualifications, continuing education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateAssigned Act No. 2017-461.
2017-05-19SenateEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenatePassed Second House
2017-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 994
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-05-11HouseRereferred from Local Legislation to County and Municipal Government
2017-03-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
2017-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 320
2017-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-03-14SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback