AL SB275 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Assigned Act No. 2021-319.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Assigned Act No. 2021-319.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Notaries public, instruments in writing acknowledged via remote notarization before July 1, 2021, ratified and validated, use of remote authorization, authorized, Sec. 36-20-73.1 added
Title
Notaries public, instruments in writing acknowledged via remote notarization before July 1, 2021, ratified and validated, use of remote authorization, authorized, Sec. 36-20-73.1 added
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Givhan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Givhan motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1102 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 921 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 920 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - HBIR: Whitt motion to Adopt Roll Call 919 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 508 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt Roll Call 507 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Givhan motion to Adopt Roll Call 506 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 921 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 920 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - HBIR: Whitt motion to Adopt Roll Call 919 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 508 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Givhan motion to Adopt Roll Call 507 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - SBIR: Givhan motion to Adopt Roll Call 506 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-319. |
2021-04-22 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-22 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Givhan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1102 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 921 |
2021-04-20 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 920 |
2021-04-20 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 508 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Givhan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 507 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Givhan Amendment Offered |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |