AL SB274 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State Auditor; powers and duties revised; Division of Investigations created
Title
State Auditor; powers and duties revised; Division of Investigations created
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt - Roll Call 880 VXFBLPL-1 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Carried Over to the Call of the Chair |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Jones motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 880 VXFBLPL-1 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Jones 1st Substitute Offered VXFBLPL-1 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Pending Senate Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |