AL SB274 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned Act No. 2021-240.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Assigned Act No. 2021-240.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Covid-19 Recovery Capital Credit Protection Act of 2021, created, employment and wage requirements for qualifying projects extended, compensation amounts for exemption purposes increased, Sec. 40-18-19.1 am'd.
Title
Covid-19 Recovery Capital Credit Protection Act of 2021, created, employment and wage requirements for qualifying projects extended, compensation amounts for exemption purposes increased, Sec. 40-18-19.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 708 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - HBIR: Motion to Adopt Roll Call 707 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 604 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 603 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 602 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - HBIR: Motion to Adopt Roll Call 707 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 604 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 603 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 602 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-240. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-04-13 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2021-04-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 708 |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 604 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 603 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
Same As/Similar To
HB211 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Assigned Act No. - on 05/26/2021.