AL SB274 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Local constitutional amendments, adoption procedure by Legislature revised, three negative votes in Senate and nine in House to require local amendment to be voted on statewide, Amendments 425 and 555, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, repealed, const. amend.
Title
Local constitutional amendments, adoption procedure by Legislature revised, three negative votes in Senate and nine in House to require local amendment to be voted on statewide, Amendments 425 and 555, Constitution of Alabama of 1901, repealed, const. amend.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Coleman-Madison [D] | Sen. Vivian Figures [D] | Sen. Priscilla Dunn [D] | Sen. Bobby Singleton [D] |
Sen. William Beasley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Coleman motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2014-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 918 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Coleman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 917 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Coleman first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Coleman motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections Amendment Offered |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |