AL SB273 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Counties, license taxes, prohibited on farmers
Title
Counties, license taxes, prohibited on farmers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Butler motion to Adopt Roll Call 830 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Butler motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry |