AL SB273 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Assigned Act No. 2017-413.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Courts, therapy dogs authorized in courtroom under certain conditions, judge authorized to use discretionary funds for

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts, therapy dogs authorized in courtroom under certain conditions, judge authorized to use discretionary funds for

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Holley motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Grimsley motion to Table (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateAssigned Act No. 2017-413.
2017-05-19SenateEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19SenateHolley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1319
2017-05-19SenateConcurrence Requested
2017-05-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1034
2017-05-19HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1033
2017-05-19HouseGrimsley Amendment Offered
2017-05-19HouseGrimsley motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1032
2017-05-19HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2017-04-13SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 603
2017-04-13SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-04-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-03-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB273&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/SB273-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=568980&VOTE=603&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579190&VOTE=1032&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579192&VOTE=1033&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579193&VOTE=1034&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579272&VOTE=1319&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback