AL SB270 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-370.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Assigned Act No. 2022-370.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery Co. and municipalities with population of 5,000 or more, certain city employees, exempt , return to classified service, provided, Sec. 45-51A-32.113 am'd.
Title
Montgomery Co. and municipalities with population of 5,000 or more, certain city employees, exempt , return to classified service, provided, Sec. 45-51A-32.113 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 923 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-04-06 - House - HBIR: Lawrence motion to Adopt Roll Call 922 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 713 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 712 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 699 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - HBIR: Lawrence motion to Adopt Roll Call 922 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 33 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 713 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Hatcher motion to Adopt Roll Call 712 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 699 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-370. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-04-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 923 |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-29 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 713 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Hatcher motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 712 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Hatcher Amendment Offered |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Chambliss motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |