AL SB270 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-407.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-407.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deceptive trade practices, allowing consumers who rely on certain information to bring action for consumer fraud, Sec. 8-19-10 am'd.
Title
Deceptive trade practices, allowing consumers who rely on certain information to bring action for consumer fraud, Sec. 8-19-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Williams motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - Motion to Adopt pending Roll Call 819 (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - Motion to Adopt pending Roll Call 819 (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-407. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Williams motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 978 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2016-05-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 826 |
2016-05-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 819 |
2016-05-03 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2016-05-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-28 | House | Motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2016-04-28 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2016-04-28 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2016-04-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-03-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 443 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Williams motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 377 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |