AL SB270 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Assigned Act No. 2015-481.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Vision care, services provided by optometrists and ophthalmologists, contracts with insurers, restrictions on

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vision care, services provided by optometrists and ophthalmologists, contracts with insurers, restrictions on

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2015-481.
2015-06-04HouseSignature Requested
2015-06-04SenateEnrolled
2015-06-04SenatePassed Second House
2015-06-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1318
2015-06-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-05-28HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-05-07SenateEngrossed
2015-05-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
2015-05-07SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 890
2015-05-07SenateBlackwell motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 889
2015-05-07SenateBanking and Insurance first Substitute Offered
2015-05-07SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-04-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2015-03-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB270
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB270-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB270-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/SB270-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=516542&VOTE=889&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=516543&VOTE=890&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=526649&VOTE=1318&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback