AL SB27 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-529.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firearm, possession prohibited at certain places including by persons with a valid pistol permit, exception for qualified retired law enforcement officers, Sec. 13A-11-61.2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearm, possession prohibited at certain places including by persons with a valid pistol permit, exception for qualified retired law enforcement officers, Sec. 13A-11-61.2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Holley motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateAssigned Act No. 2018-529.
2018-03-27HouseSignature Requested
2018-03-27HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-27SenateEnrolled
2018-03-27SenateHolley motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1164
2018-03-27SenateConcurrence Requested
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1048
2018-03-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1047
2018-03-22HouseRowe Amendment Offered
2018-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-25HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
2018-01-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 130
2018-01-25SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateHolley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-25SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-01-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback