AL SB269 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Economic Development and Tourism first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Economic Development and Tourism first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Wine and beer festivals authorized, licensed by ABC Board, allow retail sale of wine and beer by manufacturers, Sec. 28-3A-20.3 added.
Title
Wine and beer festivals authorized, licensed by ABC Board, allow retail sale of wine and beer by manufacturers, Sec. 28-3A-20.3 added.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Jones motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Economic Development and Tourism first Amendment Offered |
2019-05-02 | House | Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism with 1 amendment |
2019-05-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 381 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Jones motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 380 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry Amendment Offered |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |