AL SB269 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-419.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Disabled persons, preference for services provided by under direction of the Department of Alabama Institute for Deaf and Blind, Sec. 21-2-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disabled persons, preference for services provided by under direction of the Department of Alabama Institute for Deaf and Blind, Sec. 21-2-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-419.
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenatePassed Second House
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 893
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-05-04HouseSouth motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2016-04-28HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2016-04-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 674
2016-04-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback