AL SB268 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
Pending: House County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
Pending: House County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ports, inland facilities, $10 million of add'l. motor fuel tax levied by Act 2019-2 transferred from Rebuild Alabama Fund to Economic and Community Affairs Dept., Inland Port and Intermodal Fund created, use for inland ports and intermodal facilities to interconnect with other modes of transportation
Title
Ports, inland facilities, $10 million of add'l. motor fuel tax levied by Act 2019-2 transferred from Rebuild Alabama Fund to Economic and Community Affairs Dept., Inland Port and Intermodal Fund created, use for inland ports and intermodal facilities to interconnect with other modes of transportation
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 677 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 676 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 675 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 674 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 572 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |