AL SB268 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from County and Municipal Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Home Builders Licensure Board, authorized to collect hearing costs, increase fines for violations, and revoke certain licenses, Secs. 34-14A-1 to 34-14A-8, inclusive, 34-14A-14, 34-14A-15 am'd.
Title
Home Builders Licensure Board, authorized to collect hearing costs, increase fines for violations, and revoke certain licenses, Secs. 34-14A-1 to 34-14A-8, inclusive, 34-14A-14, 34-14A-15 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from County and Municipal Government |
2017-05-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 806 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Livingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 805 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Livingston Amendment Offered |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Livingston motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |