AL SB268 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-418.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid, inmates in city or county jail or custody of Dept. of Corrections, benefits suspended during custody

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid, inmates in city or county jail or custody of Dept. of Corrections, benefits suspended during custody

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Ward motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-418.
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenateWard motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 998
2016-05-04SenateConcurrence Requested
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 886
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 885
2016-05-04HouseJUDY Amendment #2 Offered
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 884
2016-05-04HouseJUDY Amendment #1 Offered on the 29th leg day
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-05-03HouseJudiciary Amendment #2 Offered
2016-05-03HouseMotion to Adopt pending
2016-05-03HouseJudiciary Amendment #1 Offered
2016-05-03HouseThird Reading Placed on the Calendar
2016-04-28HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2016-04-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2016-04-20SenateEngrossed
2016-04-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 695
2016-04-19SenateWard motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 694
2016-04-19SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2016-04-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-10SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-02-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB268
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/SB268-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546981&VOTE=694&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546984&VOTE=695&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552339&VOTE=884&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552341&VOTE=885&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552342&VOTE=886&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552423&VOTE=998&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback