AL SB268 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Assigned Act No. 2015-284.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Assigned Act No. 2015-284.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child support, Uniform Interstate Family Support Act adopted, registration, enforcement, and modification of foreign child support orders, Secs. 30-3D-101 to 30-3D-105, inclusive, 30-3D-201 to 30-3D-211, inclusive, 30-3D-301 to 30-3D-319, inclusive, 30-3D-401, 30-3D-402, 30-3D-501 to 30-3D-507, inclusive, 30-3D-601 to 30-3D-616, inclusive, 30-3D-701 to 30-3D-713, inclusive, 30-3D-801, 30-3D-802, 30-3D-901, 30-3D-902, added; Secs. 30-3A-101, 30-3A-102, 30-3A-103, 30-3A-201 to 30-3A-209, inclusive, 30-3A-301 to 30-3A-319, inclusive, 30-3A-401, 30-3A-501 to 30-3A-507, inclusive, 30-3A-601 to 30-3A-614, inclusive, 30-3A-701, 30-3A-801, 30-3A-802, 30-3A-901 to 30-3A-906, inclusive, repealed
Title
Child support, Uniform Interstate Family Support Act adopted, registration, enforcement, and modification of foreign child support orders, Secs. 30-3D-101 to 30-3D-105, inclusive, 30-3D-201 to 30-3D-211, inclusive, 30-3D-301 to 30-3D-319, inclusive, 30-3D-401, 30-3D-402, 30-3D-501 to 30-3D-507, inclusive, 30-3D-601 to 30-3D-616, inclusive, 30-3D-701 to 30-3D-713, inclusive, 30-3D-801, 30-3D-802, 30-3D-901, 30-3D-902, added; Secs. 30-3A-101, 30-3A-102, 30-3A-103, 30-3A-201 to 30-3A-209, inclusive, 30-3A-301 to 30-3A-319, inclusive, 30-3A-401, 30-3A-501 to 30-3A-507, inclusive, 30-3A-601 to 30-3A-614, inclusive, 30-3A-701, 30-3A-801, 30-3A-802, 30-3A-901 to 30-3A-906, inclusive, repealed
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2015-284. |
2015-05-26 | House | Signature Requested |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2015-05-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 968 |
2015-05-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 491 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |