AL SB267 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned Act No. 2018-515.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned Act No. 2018-515.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ethics Commission, enforcement provisions revised, Secs. 36-25-1, 36-25-4, 36-25-27 am'd.
Title
Ethics Commission, enforcement provisions revised, Secs. 36-25-1, 36-25-4, 36-25-27 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 20 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2018-515. |
2018-03-28 | House | Signature Requested |
2018-03-28 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Nay" |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2018-03-28 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1100 |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 944 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 942 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Ward Amendment Offered |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Ward motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |