AL SB267 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Ways and Means General Fund first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deepwater Horizon Oil Spill Disaster Settlements, creaton of authority by Legislature required to issue bonds for certain purposes, Alabama Strategic Investment Initiative, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deepwater Horizon Oil Spill Disaster Settlements, creaton of authority by Legislature required to issue bonds for certain purposes, Alabama Strategic Investment Initiative, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 37 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 9 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Hightower motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseWays and Means General Fund first Amendment Offered
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Adopt lost Roll Call 912
2016-05-04HouseBracy substitute to W&MGF Substitute lost
2016-05-04HouseWays and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered
2016-05-04HouseBracy motion to Suspend Rules adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Open
2016-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
2016-04-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
2016-04-07SenateEngrossed
2016-04-05SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 532
2016-04-05SenateOrr motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 531
2016-04-05SenateOrr first Substitute Offered
2016-04-05SenateHolley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 530
2016-04-05SenateHolley Amendment Offered
2016-04-05SenateHolley motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-05SenateHolley Amendment Offered
2016-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-05SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-05SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-05SenateHightower motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-05SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-05SenateHightower motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-05SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-03-23SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-03-23SenateHightower motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 499
2016-03-23SenateHightower first Substitute Offered
2016-03-23SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-03-17SenateHightower motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2016-03-17SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2016-03-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB267
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/SB267-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=542625&VOTE=499&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=543850&VOTE=530&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=543852&VOTE=531&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=543853&VOTE=532&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552651&VOTE=912&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback