AL SB267 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-429.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Assigned Act No. 2014-429.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Employees' Retirement System, one-time lump-sum additional payment to retirement allowance of certain retirees and beneficiaries
Title
Employees' Retirement System, one-time lump-sum additional payment to retirement allowance of certain retirees and beneficiaries
Sponsors
Sen. Del Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Bedford motion to Adopt (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Marsh motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-429. |
2014-04-03 | House | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | House | Grimsley filed conflict of interest Declaration |
2014-04-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1142 |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-19 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 645 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 644 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Bedford motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 643 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 642 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Bedford Amendment Offered |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Marsh Amendment Offered |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 641 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 640 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Marsh motion to Table adopted Roll Call 639 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 2 amendments |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |