AL SB267 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:58 on June 9, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Probation, revocation and suspension, technical violations classified on administrative violations, eligible offender and nonviolent offender defined, Secs. 15-22-54, 15-22-54.1 am'd.; Act 2010-753, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probation, revocation and suspension, technical violations classified on administrative violations, eligible offender and nonviolent offender defined, Secs. 15-22-54, 15-22-54.1 am'd.; Act 2010-753, 2010 Reg. Sess. am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 82 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Delivered to Governor at 11:58 on June 9, 2011
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-696.
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Passed Second House
2011-06-09 Hammon, Davis and Treadaway intended to vote "Nay"
2011-06-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1185
2011-06-09 Third Reading Passed
2011-06-02 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-05-31 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
2011-05-31 Engrossed
2011-05-31 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 829
2011-05-31 Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 828
2011-05-31 Judiciary Amendment Offered
2011-05-31 Third Reading Passed
2011-04-21 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2011-03-24 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB267
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB267-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB267-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/SB267-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=416606&VOTE=828&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=416607&VOTE=829&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=422261&VOTE=1185&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback