AL SB266 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy
Pending: House Children and Senior Advocacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Child custody, parenting plan required in all cases, court established plan in certain cases, remedies for violations of plan, Sec. 30-3-158 added; Secs. 30-3-150, 30-3-151, 30-3-152, 30-3-153 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child custody, parenting plan required in all cases, court established plan in certain cases, remedies for violations of plan, Sec. 30-3-158 added; Secs. 30-3-150, 30-3-151, 30-3-152, 30-3-153 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Sanders-Fortier motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Stutts motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy
2019-05-02SenateEngrossed
2019-05-02SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 584
2019-05-02SenateSanders-Fortier motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 583
2019-05-02SenateSanders-Fortier Amendment Offered
2019-05-02SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-04-30SenateStutts motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-30SenateStutts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 461
2019-04-30SenateStutts Amendment Offered
2019-04-30SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2019-04-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth and Human Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=SB266&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB266-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/SB266-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200260-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200527-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=614016&VOTE=461&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615498&VOTE=583&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=615501&VOTE=584&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback