AL SB266 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial motor vehicles in intrastate transportation, allowable variances for hours of service limitations according to federal rule or law, records requested
Title
Commercial motor vehicles in intrastate transportation, allowable variances for hours of service limitations according to federal rule or law, records requested
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Livingston motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Livingston motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy |