AL SB264 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grandparents, visitation with minor child, definition to include great-grandparent, considerations of court in determining best interests of child, Sec. 30-3-4.1 am'd.
Title
Grandparents, visitation with minor child, definition to include great-grandparent, considerations of court in determining best interests of child, Sec. 30-3-4.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Harri Smith [I] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 588 | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources |