AL SB263 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-412.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-412.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax, individual and corporate returns, date required to be filed, filed on date for corresponding federal returns, Secs. 40-18-27, 40-18-39, 40-18-42 am'd.
Title
Income tax, individual and corporate returns, date required to be filed, filed on date for corresponding federal returns, Secs. 40-18-27, 40-18-39, 40-18-42 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2016-412. |
2016-05-04 | House | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 863 |
2016-05-04 | House | Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 862 |
2016-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 379 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |