AL SB263 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1598
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Contract Review Permanent Legislative Oversight Committee, emergency contracts treatment, Secs. 29-2-41.1, 41-16-72 am'd.; Act 2011-577, 2011 Reg. Sess. am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contract Review Permanent Legislative Oversight Committee, emergency contracts treatment, Secs. 29-2-41.1, 41-16-72 am'd.; Act 2011-577, 2011 Reg. Sess. am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-17 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1598
2012-05-16 Executive Amendment Offered
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 2:57 p.m. on May 9, 2012
2012-05-09 Enrolled
2012-05-09 Signature Requested
2012-05-09 Passed Second House
2012-05-08 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1372
2012-05-08 Third Reading Passed
2012-03-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-23 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
2012-02-23 Engrossed
2012-02-23 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 166
2012-02-23 Holtzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 165
2012-02-23 Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability Amendment Offered
2012-02-23 Third Reading Passed
2012-02-16 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-02-09 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Accountability

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB263
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB263-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB263-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/SB263-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=427474&VOTE=165&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=427475&VOTE=166&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=446655&VOTE=1372&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=451243&VOTE=1598&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback