AL SB263 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, distinctive license tags, veterans, Purple Heart and Medal of Honor recipients and former prisoners of war, and surviving spouses, additional tags without payment of license tax or registration fee, including ad valorem tax, authorized, Sec. 32-6-250 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, distinctive license tags, veterans, Purple Heart and Medal of Honor recipients and former prisoners of war, and surviving spouses, additional tags without payment of license tax or registration fee, including ad valorem tax, authorized, Sec. 32-6-250 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Brooks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Public Safety | |
2010-04-06 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 366 | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |