AL SB262 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-409.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation, transportation network companies, insurance coverage and disclosure requirements, provided for

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation, transportation network companies, insurance coverage and disclosure requirements, provided for

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - Faulkner motion to Table (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Shelnutt motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateAssigned Act No. 2016-409.
2016-05-04HouseConcurred in Second House Amendment
2016-05-04HouseSignature Requested
2016-05-04SenateEnrolled
2016-05-04SenateShelnutt motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 983
2016-05-04SenateConcurrence Requested
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 851
2016-05-04HouseHanes intended to vote "Yea:
2016-05-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 850
2016-05-04HouseHammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 849
2016-05-04HouseFaulkner Amendment Offered
2016-05-04HouseFaulkner motion to Table adopted Roll Call 848
2016-05-04HouseInsurance Amendment Offered
2016-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-26HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-04-21HouseRerefered from TU&I to Insurance
2016-04-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
2016-04-20SenateEngrossed
2016-04-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 679
2016-04-19SenateShelnutt motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 678
2016-04-19SenateShelnutt Amendment Offered
2016-04-19SenateShelnutt motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 677
2016-04-19SenateShelnutt motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 676
2016-04-19SenateBanking and Insurance Amendment Offered
2016-04-19SenateBanking and Insurance Amendment Offered
2016-04-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2016-02-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=SB262
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/SB262-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546900&VOTE=676&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546901&VOTE=677&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546903&VOTE=678&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=546904&VOTE=679&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552060&VOTE=848&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552065&VOTE=849&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552066&VOTE=850&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552067&VOTE=851&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552162&VOTE=983&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback